Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/25/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/25/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 08/02/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 08/02/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 08/02/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 09/05/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/05/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 09/05/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/05/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/05/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/05/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/06/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/06/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 09/06/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 09/06/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/12/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/12/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 09/13/2001
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 09/19/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/19/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 09/21/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/24/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/24/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 09/25/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/25/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/02/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 10/04/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/11/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/12/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/16/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 10/17/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 10/31/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/01/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/01/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 11/05/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/05/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/05/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/06/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 11/06/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/13/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 11/14/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 11/14/2001
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 11/14/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 11/15/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 11/16/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/27/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/27/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/27/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/27/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 11/28/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/28/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/28/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 11/28/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 11/30/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 12/04/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/04/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 12/11/2001
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 01/23/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 01/23/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 01/23/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 01/29/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/29/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/26/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/26/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/04/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/09/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/09/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/09/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/16/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/17/2002
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 04/30/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/01/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 05/06/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/06/2002