There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Muscle Shoals National Heritage Area Study Act of 2002

Short Titles as Introduced

Muscle Shoals National Heritage Area Study Act of 2001

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of the Interior to conduct a study of the suitability and feasibility of establishing the Muscle Shoals National Heritage Area in Alabama, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
12/17/2002Became Public Law No: 107-348. (TXT | PDF)
12/17/2002Signed by President.
12/06/2002Presented to President.
11/20/2002Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR 11/19/2002 S11652-11655)
10/08/2002Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman without amendment. Without written report.
04/30/2002Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H1701)
04/11/2002Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 107-398.
07/25/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (25)

Date Chamber
12/17/2002Became Public Law No: 107-348. (TXT | PDF)
12/17/2002Signed by President.
12/06/2002HousePresented to President.
11/20/2002SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/20/2002SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR 11/19/2002 S11652-11655)
10/08/2002SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 675.
10/08/2002SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman without amendment. Without written report.
05/01/2002SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
04/30/2002-3:04pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/30/2002-3:04pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1701)
04/30/2002-2:57pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2628.
04/30/2002-2:57pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1701-1702)
04/30/2002-2:57pmHouseMr. Hansen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
04/11/2002HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 237.
04/11/2002HouseReported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 107-398.
03/20/2002HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
03/20/2002HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/11/2002HouseExecutive Comment Received from Interior.
03/07/2002HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation, and Public Lands
03/07/2002HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation, and Public Lands
02/07/2002HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation, and Public Lands
07/30/2001HouseExecutive Comment Requested from Interior.
07/30/2001HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Resources
07/25/2001HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
07/25/2001HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 01/29/2002
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 01/29/2002

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Resources07/25/2001 Referred to
03/20/2002 Markup by
04/11/2002 Reported by H. Rept. 107-398
House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation, and Public Lands07/30/2001 Referred to
02/07/2002 Hearings by
03/07/2002 Markup by
03/07/2002 Reported by
Senate Energy and Natural Resources05/01/2002 Referred to
10/08/2002 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.2628.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2628. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (04/30/2002)

Muscle Shoals National Heritage Area Study Act of 2002 - Requires the Secretary of the Interior to study and report to specified congressional committees on the suitability and feasibility of designating specified areas in Alabama as the Muscle Shoals National Heritage Area.