Committees: H.R.2628 — 107th Congress (2001-2002)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Resources07/25/2001 Referred to
03/20/2002 Markup by
04/11/2002 Reported by H. Rept. 107-398
House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation, and Public Lands07/30/2001 Referred to
02/07/2002 Hearings by
03/07/2002 Markup by
03/07/2002 Reported by
Senate Energy and Natural Resources05/01/2002 Referred to
10/08/2002 Reported by