Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 07/25/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 07/25/2001
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 07/25/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 07/26/2001
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/29/2002
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/09/2002
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/14/2002