Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 07/25/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 07/25/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 07/25/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 07/25/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/25/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 07/25/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 07/25/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 07/25/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/25/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49]* 07/25/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/25/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 07/25/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/25/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 07/25/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 07/25/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 07/25/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 07/25/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 07/25/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 07/25/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 07/25/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27]* 07/25/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 07/25/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 07/25/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/25/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 07/25/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 07/25/2001
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32]* 07/25/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 07/25/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/10/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/10/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 09/10/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/10/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/10/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/10/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 09/10/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 09/10/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/10/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 09/10/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/10/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/13/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 09/24/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/04/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/04/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/09/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/09/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 10/11/2001
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 10/23/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 10/29/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 10/30/2001
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 10/30/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 11/01/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 11/07/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/16/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 12/04/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 12/04/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/04/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 12/04/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/04/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 12/18/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 12/18/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 12/19/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 12/19/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 01/24/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 01/24/2002
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 01/24/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/24/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 01/24/2002
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 01/24/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 01/24/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 01/24/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 01/24/2002
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 01/24/2002
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 01/29/2002
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 01/29/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/29/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 01/29/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 01/29/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 01/29/2002
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 01/29/2002
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 01/29/2002
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/06/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/06/2002
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 02/06/2002
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 02/06/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 02/14/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/14/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 02/14/2002
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 02/14/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 02/14/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/14/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/27/2002
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/27/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/27/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/05/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/05/2002
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/05/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/05/2002
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/05/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 03/05/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/12/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/12/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 03/12/2002
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/12/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/12/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/12/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/12/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 03/18/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/18/2002
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/18/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/18/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 03/18/2002
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/20/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/20/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/20/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 03/20/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/20/2002
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/10/2002
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 04/10/2002
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/10/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/10/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/10/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 04/10/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/10/2002
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/16/2002
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/16/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/18/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 04/30/2002
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/30/2002
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 04/30/2002
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 04/30/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 04/30/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/02/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/02/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/02/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 05/02/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/02/2002
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 05/02/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/02/2002
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/02/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/02/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/02/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/02/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 05/02/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/02/2002
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 05/02/2002
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/02/2002
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/02/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/15/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 05/15/2002
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 05/15/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 05/15/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/21/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/21/2002
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/21/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/04/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/04/2002
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/04/2002
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/04/2002
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/04/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/04/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/13/2002
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/13/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/13/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/21/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/15/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/23/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/23/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/23/2002
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 07/23/2002
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/04/2002
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 09/04/2002
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/04/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/04/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/04/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 09/04/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/17/2002
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 09/17/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/17/2002
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/17/2002
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 10/07/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/07/2002
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/07/2002
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/07/2002
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 10/10/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/13/2002
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 11/13/2002