Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/26/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 07/26/2001
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 07/26/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 07/26/2001
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 07/26/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 07/26/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 07/26/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 07/26/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 07/26/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 07/26/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 07/26/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 07/26/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 07/26/2001
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 07/26/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 07/26/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 07/26/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/26/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 07/26/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 07/26/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/26/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 07/26/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 07/26/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 07/26/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/26/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 07/26/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 08/02/2001
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 08/02/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 08/02/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 08/02/2001
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 03/07/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/07/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/07/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/07/2002
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 03/07/2002
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 03/07/2002
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/12/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/12/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/12/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 03/12/2002
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/12/2002
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/12/2002
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/12/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/12/2002
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/12/2002
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/12/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/12/2002
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 03/12/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/12/2002
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 04/09/2002
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 04/09/2002
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 04/09/2002
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 04/09/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/09/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 04/09/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/01/2002
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/01/2002
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/01/2002
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/01/2002
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/01/2002
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 05/02/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/02/2002
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 05/16/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 05/16/2002
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/16/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/16/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/16/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/16/2002
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/23/2002
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 05/23/2002
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 05/23/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 06/24/2002
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 06/24/2002
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/24/2002
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 06/24/2002
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/24/2002
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 07/26/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/26/2002
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/26/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/26/2002
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 07/26/2002
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 09/04/2002
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 09/04/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 09/25/2002
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/25/2002
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/25/2002
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 09/25/2002
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/25/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/25/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/25/2002
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/25/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 09/25/2002
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 09/25/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/25/2002
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 09/25/2002
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 11/13/2002
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 11/13/2002