Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/30/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 01/30/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/30/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/14/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/14/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/14/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/14/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 02/14/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/14/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 02/14/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/14/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/14/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/14/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/14/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/06/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 03/06/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/06/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/06/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/06/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/06/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/06/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/29/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/29/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/29/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/22/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 05/22/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/26/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/26/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/12/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/12/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/12/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 08/02/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 08/02/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 09/25/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/06/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/06/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 01/23/2002