Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 07/26/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 07/26/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 07/26/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/26/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 07/26/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/27/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 08/02/2001
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 09/06/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/10/2001
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 09/14/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/25/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/16/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/16/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/16/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/29/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/29/2001
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 02/14/2002
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 02/14/2002
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 03/12/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/12/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/09/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/09/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/11/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/11/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/11/2002
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 04/17/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/17/2002
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/01/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/01/2002
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/07/2002
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/16/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/04/2002