Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 07/27/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 07/27/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 07/27/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 07/27/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 07/27/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/27/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/27/2001
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large]* 07/27/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 07/27/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 07/27/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 07/27/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 07/27/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 07/27/2001
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 07/27/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 07/27/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 07/27/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 07/27/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 07/27/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 07/27/2001
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 07/27/2001
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 07/27/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 07/27/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 07/27/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 07/27/2001
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 07/27/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 07/27/2001
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 07/27/2001
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 07/27/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/30/2001
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/31/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/31/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 07/31/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/31/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/31/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 07/31/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 07/31/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 08/02/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/05/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 11/07/2001