Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49]* 07/31/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 07/31/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 07/31/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 07/31/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 07/31/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 07/31/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 07/31/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 07/31/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/31/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/31/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 07/31/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 07/31/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 08/01/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/25/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/25/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 10/30/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 12/12/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 02/12/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/12/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/12/2002
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 02/27/2002
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 04/18/2002
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/04/2002
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 06/06/2002
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/22/2002