Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 08/01/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 08/01/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 08/01/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 08/01/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 08/01/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 08/01/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/12/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/12/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/12/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 09/12/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/12/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/28/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/28/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/28/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/28/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/28/2001
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 10/12/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 10/12/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 10/12/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 10/16/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/06/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/06/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/26/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/26/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/26/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 09/26/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/26/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/26/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/26/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 09/26/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/26/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/30/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/30/2002
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/30/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/16/2002