Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 08/02/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 08/02/2001
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/12/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/12/2001
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 09/12/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 09/12/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 12/06/2001
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 12/20/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/11/2002
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/11/2002
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 04/11/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/11/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/11/2002
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/11/2002
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 04/11/2002
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 04/11/2002
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/11/2002
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 04/11/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/11/2002
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/11/2002
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/11/2002
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 04/11/2002
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/11/2002
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/11/2002
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/11/2002
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/11/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/11/2002
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 04/11/2002
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/11/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 04/11/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/11/2002
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/16/2002
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 04/16/2002
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 04/16/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/16/2002
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 04/16/2002
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 04/18/2002
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 04/18/2002
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/18/2002
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/18/2002
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/18/2002
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 04/18/2002
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/18/2002
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/18/2002
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 04/18/2002
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/18/2002
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/18/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 04/18/2002
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 04/18/2002
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 04/18/2002
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/18/2002
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/18/2002
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 04/18/2002
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 04/18/2002
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 04/18/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/18/2002
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 04/18/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 04/25/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 04/25/2002
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 05/02/2002
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 05/02/2002
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 05/02/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/08/2002
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/08/2002
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/09/2002
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/09/2002
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 05/09/2002
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 05/09/2002
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/09/2002
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/09/2002
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 05/09/2002
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/09/2002
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/09/2002
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 05/09/2002
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/09/2002
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/09/2002
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 05/09/2002
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/09/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/09/2002
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 05/09/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/09/2002
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/09/2002
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/09/2002
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/09/2002
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/09/2002
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/09/2002