Text: H.R.2739 — 107th Congress (2001-2002)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 107-158 (04/04/2002)

 
[107th Congress Public Law 158]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]


<DOC>
[DOCID: f:publ158.107]


[[Page 116 STAT. 121]]

Public Law 107-158
107th Congress

                                 An Act


 
To amend Public Law 107-10 to authorize a United States plan to endorse 
and obtain observer status for Taiwan at the annual summit of the World 
   Health Assembly in May 2002 in Geneva, Switzerland, and for other 
            purposes. <<NOTE: Apr. 4, 2002 -  [H.R. 2739]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. AMENDMENTS TO PUBLIC LAW 107-10.

    (a) Findings.--Section 1(a) of Public Law 107-10 (115 Stat. 17) is 
amended by adding at the end the following:
            ``(12) On May 11, 2001, President Bush stated in his letter 
        to Senator Murkowski that the United States `should find 
        opportunities for Taiwan's voice to be heard in international 
        organizations in order to make a contribution, even if 
        membership is not possible', further stating that his 
        Administration `has focused on finding concrete ways for Taiwan 
        to benefit and contribute to the WHO.'.
            ``(13) On May 16, 2001, as part of the United States 
        delegation to the World Health Assembly meeting in Geneva, 
        Switzerland, Secretary of Health and Human Services Tommy 
        Thompson announced to the American International Club the 
        Administration's support of Taiwan's participation in the 
        activities of the WHO.''.

    (b) Plan.--Section 1(b)(1) of <<NOTE: 115 Stat. 18.>> Public Law 
107-10 (115 Stat. 17) is amended by striking ``May 2001'' and inserting 
``May 2002''.

    Approved April 4, 2002.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.R. 2739:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD:
                                                        Vol. 147 (2001):
                                    Dec. 19, considered and passed 
                                        House.
                                                        Vol. 148 (2002):
                                    Mar. 19, considered and passed 
                                        Senate.

                                  <all>