There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the construction of a Native American Cultural Center and Museum in Oklahoma City, Oklahoma.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
12/11/2001Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9184)
12/06/2001Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 107-326.
08/02/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
01/23/2002SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 311.
12/20/2001SenateRead the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
12/12/2001SenateReceived in the Senate.
12/11/2001-9:41pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/11/2001-9:41pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9184)
12/11/2001-9:23pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2742.
12/11/2001-9:23pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9184-9187)
12/11/2001-9:23pmHouseMr. McInnis moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
12/06/2001HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 197.
12/06/2001HouseReported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 107-326.
Action By: Committee on Resources
11/28/2001HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Resources
11/28/2001HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Resources
10/26/2001HouseExecutive Comment Received from Interior.
Action By: Committee on Resources
10/17/2001HouseCommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: Committee on Resources
08/20/2001HouseExecutive Comment Requested from Interior.
Action By: Committee on Resources
08/02/2001HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
08/02/2001HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 08/02/2001

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Resources08/02/2001 Referred to
10/17/2001 Hearings by
11/28/2001 Markup by
12/06/2001 Reported by H. Rept. 107-326

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2742. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (12/11/2001)

Directs the Secretary of the Interior to offer to award financial assistance grants and technical assistance to the Native American Cultural and Educational Authority of Oklahoma for the development of the Native American Cultural Center and Museum in Oklahoma City, Oklahoma.

Requires the Authority, to be eligible to receive such a grant, to: (1) agree to provide for continual maintenance of the Center without the use of Federal funds; and (2) demonstrate commitments from private persons or State or local government agencies for at least 66 percent of the cost of the activities to be carried out under the grant. Limits the amount of any such grant to 33 percent of the cost of the activities to be funded under such grant.

Requires the Secretary, when calculating the Authority's cost share, to reduce such cost share obligation by the fair market value of approximately 300 acres of land donated by Oklahoma City for the Center, if such land is used for the Center.

Authorizes appropriations.