Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/05/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/05/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/10/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/10/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/10/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/13/2001
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/13/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/13/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/13/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/13/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/24/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/24/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/24/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/24/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 09/25/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/04/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/04/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/04/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 10/10/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 11/28/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/12/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/12/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/12/2002
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/12/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/05/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/05/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/05/2002
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/05/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/20/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/20/2002