Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 08/02/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/05/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 09/05/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/06/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/06/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/20/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/20/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/25/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/25/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/28/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/02/2001
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/02/2001
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 10/02/2001
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 10/02/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/04/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 10/04/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 10/04/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 10/04/2001
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 10/05/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 10/05/2001
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 10/09/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/09/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/09/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 10/09/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/16/2001
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 10/16/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/16/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/16/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/16/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/30/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 11/07/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 11/13/2001