Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 01/30/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 01/30/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 01/30/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 01/30/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 01/30/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 01/30/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 01/30/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 01/30/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 01/30/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 01/30/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 01/30/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 01/30/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/30/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/30/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/30/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 01/30/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 01/30/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/30/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 01/30/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 01/30/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 01/30/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/30/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/30/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 01/30/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 01/30/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 01/30/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 01/30/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 01/30/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/30/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 01/30/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/30/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 01/30/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/30/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/30/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 01/30/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 01/30/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/30/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 01/30/2001
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 01/30/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/30/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/30/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 01/30/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 01/30/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 01/30/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 01/30/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/30/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 01/30/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 01/30/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 01/30/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 01/30/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 01/30/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 01/30/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 01/30/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 01/30/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 01/30/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 01/30/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 01/30/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 01/30/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 01/30/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/30/2001
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 01/30/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 01/30/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/30/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 01/30/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 01/30/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/30/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 01/30/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 01/30/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 01/30/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 01/30/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/30/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 01/30/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/30/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 01/30/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 01/30/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 02/06/2001
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 02/06/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 02/06/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 02/06/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 02/06/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/06/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/06/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/06/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/06/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/06/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 02/06/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 02/06/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/06/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/06/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 02/06/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/06/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/06/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 02/06/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/06/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/13/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 02/13/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 02/13/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 02/13/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/13/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 02/13/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/13/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/13/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/13/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/13/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/13/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 02/13/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/13/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 02/13/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/13/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 02/13/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/06/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 03/06/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/06/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 03/06/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/06/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/06/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/06/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/07/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/07/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/15/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 03/15/2001
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/15/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 03/20/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/20/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 03/20/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/20/2001
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 03/20/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 03/20/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 03/20/2001
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/22/2001
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 03/22/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/28/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/28/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/28/2001
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 04/03/2001
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 04/03/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/03/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/24/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/01/2001
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 05/01/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/12/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/12/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 06/14/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/27/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/17/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/17/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 08/02/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/06/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/20/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/01/2001