There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

National Language Act of 2001

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 4, United States Code, to declare English as the official language of the Government of the United States, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/30/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
03/15/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Education Reform.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
02/12/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/30/2001Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/30/2001Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/30/2001Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/30/2001Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (49)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/30/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/27/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/27/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 03/29/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/29/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/29/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/29/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/03/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/03/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/03/2001
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 04/03/2001
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-44] 04/03/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 04/03/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 04/03/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 04/03/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/03/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 04/03/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 04/03/2001
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 04/03/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/03/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/04/2001
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 04/04/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/24/2001
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 04/24/2001
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 04/26/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 04/26/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/01/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 05/01/2001
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 05/02/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/02/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 05/03/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/08/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/08/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/10/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/15/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/19/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/20/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/26/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/28/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 11/27/2001
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 11/27/2001
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 11/27/2001
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 11/30/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 12/04/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 12/04/2001
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/24/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 01/24/2002
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/09/2002
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/01/2002

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce01/30/2001 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Education Reform03/15/2001 Referred to
House Judiciary01/30/2001 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution02/12/2001 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.280.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.280. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/30/2001)

National Language Act of 2001 - Makes English the official language of the U.S. Government. Requires the Government to conduct its official business in English, including publications, income tax forms, and informational materials.

Provides that this Act shall not apply to the use of a language other than English for religious purposes, for training in foreign languages for international communication, to programs in schools designed to encourage students to learn foreign languages, or by persons over age 62.

Repeals the Bilingual Education Act. Terminates the Office of Bilingual Education and Minority Languages Affairs in the Department of Education.

Repeals provisions of the Voting Rights Act of 1965 regarding bilingual election requirements and regarding congressional findings of voting discrimination against language minorities, prohibition of English-only elections, and other remedial measures.

Amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to require that all public ceremonies in which the oath of allegiance is administered pursuant to such Act be conducted solely in English.

Specifies that this Act shall not preempt the law of any State.