Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/30/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/27/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/27/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 03/29/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/29/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/29/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/29/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/03/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/03/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/03/2001
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 04/03/2001
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 04/03/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 04/03/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 04/03/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 04/03/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/03/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 04/03/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 04/03/2001
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 04/03/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/03/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/04/2001
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 04/04/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/24/2001
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 04/24/2001
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 04/26/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 04/26/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/01/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 05/01/2001
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 05/02/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/02/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 05/03/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/08/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/08/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/10/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/15/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/19/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/20/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/26/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/28/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 11/27/2001
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 11/27/2001
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 11/27/2001
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 11/30/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 12/04/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 12/04/2001
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/24/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 01/24/2002
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/09/2002
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/01/2002