Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/06/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/06/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 09/25/2001
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 09/28/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/28/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 11/29/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 01/23/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 03/19/2002
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/05/2002