Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 08/02/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/05/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/06/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/10/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 10/30/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/18/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/19/2002