Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/05/2001
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 09/05/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 09/05/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 09/05/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 09/05/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/05/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/05/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 09/10/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/10/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 09/10/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 09/10/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 09/12/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/12/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 10/12/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 10/12/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/27/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 11/27/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 11/27/2001
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 12/20/2001
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 01/29/2002
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 01/29/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 01/29/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/29/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 01/29/2002
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 01/29/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/05/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/13/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 02/13/2002
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 04/11/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/11/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 04/11/2002
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 04/11/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/16/2002
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/16/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/23/2002
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 05/23/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 07/18/2002