Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/25/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/25/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/25/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/25/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/25/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 09/25/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/25/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/25/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/25/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/25/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 09/25/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/06/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 11/06/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/06/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 11/06/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 11/06/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 11/06/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/06/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 11/15/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/15/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 11/15/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 11/15/2001
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 11/15/2001
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 11/15/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 11/15/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 11/15/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 11/15/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/15/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 11/15/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 11/15/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 11/15/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 11/15/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 11/15/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/15/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 11/15/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 11/15/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 11/15/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/16/2001
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 11/16/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 11/29/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 12/05/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 12/05/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 12/05/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 12/18/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/29/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 01/29/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/05/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/05/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/05/2002
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 02/05/2002
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/05/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/05/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/05/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/05/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/05/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/05/2002
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 02/07/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/07/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 02/12/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/12/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/13/2002
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 02/26/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 02/26/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/26/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/26/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/26/2002
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 02/26/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/27/2002
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/27/2002
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 02/27/2002
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 02/27/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/06/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 03/06/2002
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/06/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 03/06/2002
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/13/2002
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/13/2002
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/13/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/13/2002
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/13/2002
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/13/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/13/2002
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 03/13/2002
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 03/13/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/13/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/13/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/13/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/13/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/13/2002
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/13/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 03/13/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/13/2002
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/13/2002
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 03/19/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/19/2002
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 03/19/2002
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 03/19/2002
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/19/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/19/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/19/2002
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/19/2002
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/19/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/19/2002
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/09/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/09/2002
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 04/09/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 04/09/2002
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/09/2002
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/09/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 04/09/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/10/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 04/10/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 04/11/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 04/11/2002
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/11/2002
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 04/11/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 04/16/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 04/16/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/16/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 04/16/2002
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 04/18/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/18/2002
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/18/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/18/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/18/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/18/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/18/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 04/18/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/18/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/18/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/23/2002
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 04/23/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/23/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/23/2002
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/23/2002
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/23/2002
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/24/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/24/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/30/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 04/30/2002
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/30/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/30/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/30/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/30/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/30/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/01/2002
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 05/02/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/02/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/08/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/08/2002
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 05/09/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 05/09/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/09/2002
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/16/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 05/22/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/05/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/05/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/15/2002
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/24/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/19/2002
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 11/14/2002
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 11/19/2002