Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 08/02/2001
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 11/16/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/14/2002
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 02/14/2002
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/14/2002
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 02/14/2002
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 02/14/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 02/14/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 02/14/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 02/14/2002
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 04/11/2002
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/11/2002
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/11/2002
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 04/11/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/11/2002
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 04/11/2002
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 04/11/2002
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 04/11/2002
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/11/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/11/2002
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 04/11/2002
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 04/11/2002
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 04/11/2002
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 04/11/2002
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 04/11/2002
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/11/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/11/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 04/11/2002
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/24/2002
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 04/24/2002
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 04/24/2002
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 04/24/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/24/2002
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 05/02/2002
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/16/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/16/2002
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/16/2002
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/16/2002
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/19/2002