Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 09/06/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/21/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 10/02/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 10/09/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 11/14/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 11/14/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 12/05/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 01/24/2002
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 01/29/2002
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 01/29/2002