Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 09/10/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 09/10/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 09/10/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 09/10/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/05/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 10/05/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/05/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/05/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 10/31/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/05/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/06/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/12/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/12/2002
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 03/13/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/14/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/18/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/20/2002
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/20/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/09/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/09/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/09/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/11/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 04/11/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 04/16/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 04/16/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/16/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/18/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/18/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/24/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/25/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/25/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/25/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/25/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/25/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/30/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 04/30/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/30/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 04/30/2002
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/30/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/30/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/01/2002
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/01/2002
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/01/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/01/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/02/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 05/02/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 05/07/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/07/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/07/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/07/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/07/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/07/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/09/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/09/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/09/2002
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/09/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/14/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/14/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 05/14/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/14/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/14/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 05/14/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/14/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/15/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/15/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/15/2002
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/16/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/16/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/20/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/20/2002
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/20/2002
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/20/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/20/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 05/20/2002
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/21/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/21/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 05/21/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/21/2002
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/04/2002
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/04/2002
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/04/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/04/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/04/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/05/2002
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/05/2002
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/06/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/06/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/11/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/11/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/11/2002
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 06/11/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 06/12/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 06/12/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/12/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/12/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/12/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/12/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/12/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/13/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/13/2002
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/13/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/13/2002
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 06/18/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/18/2002
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/18/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 06/20/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/20/2002
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/20/2002
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/20/2002
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/25/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/25/2002
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/25/2002
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/27/2002
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/27/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/27/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 06/27/2002
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 07/08/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/08/2002
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/12/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/12/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/17/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 07/17/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/17/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/22/2002
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/26/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/04/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 09/04/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/04/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/04/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/04/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/10/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/10/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/10/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 09/10/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 09/10/2002
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/17/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/17/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/19/2002
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 09/19/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 09/19/2002
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/25/2002
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/26/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/01/2002
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/03/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/03/2002
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/03/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/03/2002
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 10/08/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/08/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/09/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/09/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 10/10/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 10/16/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/16/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 11/12/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 11/12/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/12/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/12/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 11/12/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 11/12/2002