Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/21/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/21/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/21/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/21/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/21/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/21/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/21/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 09/21/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/21/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/21/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/21/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 09/21/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/21/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 09/21/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 09/21/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/21/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/21/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 09/21/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 09/21/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/21/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/21/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 09/24/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/24/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/24/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 09/24/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 09/25/2001
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 09/25/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/25/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 09/25/2001
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/25/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/04/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 10/04/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 10/04/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/12/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/31/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/01/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 11/07/2001