Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 09/19/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 11/14/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/14/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 12/04/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 12/04/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/13/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/08/2002