Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 09/19/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 09/19/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 09/19/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 09/19/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 09/19/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 09/19/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 09/19/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 09/19/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 09/19/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 09/19/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 09/19/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 09/19/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 09/19/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 09/19/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 09/21/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/21/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/21/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/21/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/21/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/21/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/21/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 09/21/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/21/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/21/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/21/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/21/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 09/21/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/25/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 09/25/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/02/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 10/02/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/02/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 10/02/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/02/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/02/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/12/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 11/01/2001