Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 09/20/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 09/20/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 09/20/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 09/20/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 09/20/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 09/20/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 09/20/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 09/20/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 09/20/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 09/20/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/21/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/21/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/21/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/21/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 09/21/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/21/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/21/2001
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 09/21/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 09/21/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 09/21/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 09/21/2001
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/21/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 09/21/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/21/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 09/21/2001
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 09/21/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/21/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/21/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/21/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/21/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/21/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/21/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/21/2001
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/21/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/21/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 09/21/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/21/2001
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/21/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/21/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/21/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/21/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/21/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 09/21/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/21/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/21/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/21/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/21/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/21/2001
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 09/21/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/21/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 09/21/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/24/2001
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/24/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/24/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 09/24/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 09/24/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/24/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/24/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/24/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/24/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/24/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/24/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/24/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/24/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/24/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 09/24/2001
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 09/24/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/24/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/25/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/25/2001
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/25/2001
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 09/25/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 09/25/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/25/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/25/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/25/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/25/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/25/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/25/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 09/25/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/25/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/25/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/25/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 09/25/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 09/25/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/25/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 09/25/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 10/02/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/02/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/02/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/02/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/02/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 10/02/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 10/02/2001
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 10/05/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/05/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 10/05/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 01/29/2002