Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 01/30/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 01/30/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 01/30/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 01/30/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 01/30/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 01/30/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 01/30/2001
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 02/06/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 02/06/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/06/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 02/06/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 02/06/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 02/06/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 02/06/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/06/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/13/2001
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 02/13/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/13/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/01/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/01/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/01/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 03/01/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/01/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 03/15/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 03/22/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 03/28/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 04/24/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/08/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 05/25/2001
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/25/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/26/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/05/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/09/2002
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/26/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/05/2002