Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27]* 09/21/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/24/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/24/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/24/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 09/24/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/24/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/24/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/24/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/24/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/24/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 09/24/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/24/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/24/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/24/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/24/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/24/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 09/24/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/24/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 09/24/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 09/24/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/24/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/25/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 09/25/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/25/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 09/25/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/25/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/25/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/25/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/25/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/25/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/25/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/25/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/25/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 09/25/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/28/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 09/28/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 10/02/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/02/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/02/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/02/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/02/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 10/02/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/02/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/02/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/02/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/02/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 10/02/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/02/2001
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 10/04/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/04/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 10/04/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 10/04/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/04/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 10/04/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 10/04/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/04/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/04/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/04/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/04/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 10/04/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/04/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/04/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 10/04/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 10/04/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/04/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 10/04/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 10/05/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/09/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/11/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/12/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/12/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/16/2001