Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 09/21/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 09/21/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 09/21/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/06/2002
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/06/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 03/06/2002
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 03/20/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/20/2002
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/20/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/20/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/20/2002
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 04/11/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 04/16/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/16/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/16/2002