Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 09/21/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 09/21/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 10/03/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 01/24/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/06/2002
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 02/13/2002