Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/28/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 09/28/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 10/02/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 10/02/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 10/04/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 10/04/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/10/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/10/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/16/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/16/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 10/29/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 10/29/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 11/01/2001