Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 09/24/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 09/24/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 09/24/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 09/24/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 09/24/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 09/24/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 09/24/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 09/24/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 09/24/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 09/24/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 09/24/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 09/24/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 09/24/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 09/24/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 09/24/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/24/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/25/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/25/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/25/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/25/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/25/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 09/25/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/25/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/25/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/25/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 09/25/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/25/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/25/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/25/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/25/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/25/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 09/25/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 09/25/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/25/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/25/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 09/25/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/25/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/25/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/25/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 09/25/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 09/25/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/25/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/25/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/25/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/25/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/25/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/25/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/25/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/25/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/25/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/25/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/25/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/25/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/25/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/25/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/25/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 09/25/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/25/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 09/25/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 09/25/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/25/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/25/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 09/25/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/28/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/28/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/28/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/28/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/28/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/28/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/28/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/28/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/28/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 09/28/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/28/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/02/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/02/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/02/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/02/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 10/02/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/02/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 10/02/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 10/02/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/02/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/02/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 10/02/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 10/02/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 10/02/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 10/02/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/02/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 10/02/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/02/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/02/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/02/2001
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/02/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/02/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/02/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 10/02/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/02/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/02/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/02/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/02/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/02/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/04/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/04/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 10/04/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 10/04/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 10/04/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 10/04/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/04/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 10/04/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/04/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 10/04/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 10/04/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 10/04/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 10/04/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/04/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/04/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/04/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/04/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/04/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/04/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/09/2001
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 10/09/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 10/09/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 10/09/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/09/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 10/10/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/10/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/10/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 10/10/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/11/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 10/12/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 10/12/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 10/12/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/16/2001
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 10/30/2001
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 10/30/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/30/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/30/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 11/01/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/01/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 11/01/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/06/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/06/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 11/06/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 11/06/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 11/06/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 11/07/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 11/08/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/08/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 11/13/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 11/13/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 11/15/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 11/15/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/15/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 11/27/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 01/24/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/05/2002