Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 11/07/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/07/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 11/07/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/07/2001
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 11/07/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 11/07/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 11/07/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/07/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/07/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/07/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/07/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 11/07/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 11/07/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 11/07/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 11/07/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 11/07/2001
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 11/07/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 11/07/2001
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 11/07/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 11/07/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 11/07/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/07/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 11/07/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 11/07/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 11/07/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 11/07/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/07/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/07/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 11/07/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 11/07/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/07/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 11/07/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/07/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/07/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 11/07/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 11/07/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 11/07/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/07/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 11/07/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/07/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/07/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 11/07/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 11/07/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/07/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 11/07/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 11/07/2001
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 11/07/2001
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 11/07/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 11/07/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 11/07/2001
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 11/07/2001
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/07/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/07/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 11/07/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 11/07/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 11/07/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/07/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 11/07/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 11/07/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 11/07/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/07/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 11/07/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 11/07/2001
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 11/07/2001
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 11/07/2001
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 11/07/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 11/07/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/07/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/08/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/08/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 11/08/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 11/08/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 11/08/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 11/08/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 11/08/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 11/08/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 11/08/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 11/08/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 11/08/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 11/14/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/14/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/19/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 11/19/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 11/19/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 11/30/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/30/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/30/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 11/30/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/30/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/30/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 11/30/2001