There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Medicare Coordinated Community Care Act of 2001

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to make the social health maintenance organization a permanent option under the Medicare+Choice program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/25/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
04/23/2002Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E611)
Action By: House of Representatives
04/18/2002Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E577)
Action By: House of Representatives
10/05/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
10/02/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
09/25/2001Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/25/2001Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/25/2001Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/25/2001Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (48)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 12/04/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/04/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/27/2002
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/27/2002
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 02/27/2002
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 02/27/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/05/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/05/2002
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 03/05/2002
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/12/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/12/2002
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 03/12/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/09/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/09/2002
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 04/09/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 04/09/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 04/09/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/09/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/17/2002
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/17/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/18/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/23/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/23/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 05/07/2002
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 05/09/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/09/2002
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 05/09/2002
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/14/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/14/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 05/20/2002
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/22/2002
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/05/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/05/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/11/2002
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 06/11/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/12/2002
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 06/12/2002
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 06/12/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/20/2002
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-44] 06/20/2002
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 06/20/2002
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/20/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/04/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/04/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/04/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/12/2002
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 09/18/2002
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 10/08/2002

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means09/25/2001 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health10/02/2001 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce09/25/2001 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health10/05/2001 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2953.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2953. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/25/2001)

Medicare Coordinated Community Care Act of 2001 - Amends part C (Medicare+Choice) of title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act (SSA) to make the social health maintenance organizations (SHMOS) a permanent option under the Medicare+Choice program as coordinated community care plans which offer benefits for certain chronic illness care, home and community-based, supplemental non-acute institutional, and end-of-life and palliative care services.

Directs the Secretary of Health and Human Services to establish a National Advisory Committee on Social HMO Replication to assist Medicare+Choice plans, health care providers, and other appropriate organizations in the design, implementation, and ongoing evaluation of coordinated community care plans under this Act.