Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 09/25/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 09/25/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 09/25/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 09/25/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 09/25/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 10/02/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/02/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 10/02/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/02/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/02/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/03/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 10/03/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/03/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 10/03/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 10/03/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/03/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 10/03/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/03/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 10/03/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/03/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/03/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/03/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 10/03/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/03/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 10/03/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/03/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/03/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 10/03/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 10/03/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 10/03/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/03/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 10/03/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/03/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/03/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/03/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/05/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 10/05/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/05/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/05/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 10/05/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/05/2001
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 10/05/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/05/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 10/05/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/05/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 10/05/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/05/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/09/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 10/10/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/10/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/10/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/10/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/16/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/16/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 10/16/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/16/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/16/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/16/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 10/17/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 10/17/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/31/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/31/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 11/27/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 12/06/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/04/2002