Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 10/04/2001
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 10/04/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 10/04/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/04/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/10/2001
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 10/10/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/17/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 10/17/2001
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/23/2002
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 01/24/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 01/29/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/12/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 04/16/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/16/2002
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/04/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/18/2002