Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 09/25/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 10/04/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/04/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 10/04/2001
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 10/04/2001
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 10/04/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/27/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/27/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/13/2002
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/23/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/23/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 06/05/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/18/2002
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/21/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/26/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/26/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/11/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/11/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/11/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/11/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/11/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 07/11/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/16/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/26/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/26/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/10/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 09/10/2002