Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 09/25/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 09/25/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 09/25/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/02/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 10/02/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/02/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 10/02/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 10/02/2001
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 10/02/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/11/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/11/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 11/01/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/05/2001