There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

American Spirit Fraud Prevention Act

Short Titles as Introduced

American Spirit Fraud Prevention Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Trade Commission Act to increase civil penalties for violations involving certain proscribed acts or practices that exploit popular reaction to an emergency or major disaster declared by the President, and to authorize the Federal Trade Commission to seek civil penalties for such violations in actions brought under section 13 of that Act.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
11/13/2001 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8107)
11/09/2001 Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 107-276.
10/02/2001 Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
11/14/2001 Senate Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
11/13/2001-8:31pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/13/2001-8:31pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8107)
11/13/2001-8:16pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2985.
11/13/2001-8:16pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8107-8109)
11/13/2001-8:16pm House Mr. Tauzin moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
11/09/2001 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 166.
11/09/2001 House Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 107-276.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
10/11/2001 House Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
10/11/2001 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
10/03/2001 House Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Commerce, Trade and Consumer Protection
10/03/2001 House Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Commerce, Trade and Consumer Protection
10/02/2001 House Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
10/02/2001 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Trade and Consumer Protection.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
10/02/2001 House Introduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce10/02/2001 Referred to
10/11/2001 Markup by
11/09/2001 Reported by H. Rept. 107-276
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Commerce, Trade and Consumer Protection10/02/2001 Referred to
10/03/2001 Markup by
10/03/2001 Reported by
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation11/14/2001 Referred to

Related Bills (0)

No related bill information was received for H.R.2985.

Subjects (9)

  • Consumer protection
  • Deceptive advertising
  • Disasters
  • Fines (Penalties)
  • Fraud
  • Restrictive trade practices

Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2985. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House without amendment (11/09/2001)

American Spirit Fraud Prevention Act - Amends the Federal Trade Commission Act to: (1) double civil penalties imposed for committing unfair or deceptive acts or practices if such acts or practices exploit popular reaction during a presidentially declared emergency or disaster period; and (2) direct the court to impose a monetary civil penalty on a person found in an action seeking a temporary restraining order or preliminary injunction to have committed such a violation (including dissemination of a false advertisement) during such period.