There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Lower Rio Grande Valley Water Resources Conservation and Improvement Act of 2002

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Lower Rio Grande Valley Water Resources Conservation and Improvement Act of 2002

Short Titles as Introduced

Lower Rio Grande Valley Water Resources Conservation and Improvement Act of 2001

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Lower Rio Grande Valley Water Resources Conservation and Improvement Act of 2000 to authorize additional projects under that Act, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
12/17/2002Became Public Law No: 107-351. (TXT | PDF)
12/17/2002Signed by President.
12/06/2002Presented to President.
11/20/2002Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR 11/19/2002 S11652-11655)
10/08/2002Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman without amendment. Without written report.
07/22/2002Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5006)
07/16/2002Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 107-580.
10/02/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (25)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/17/2002Became Public Law No: 107-351. (TXT | PDF)
12/17/2002Signed by President.
12/06/2002HousePresented to President.
11/20/2002SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/20/2002SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR 11/19/2002 S11652-11655)
10/08/2002SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 677.
10/08/2002SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman without amendment. Without written report.
07/31/2002SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power
07/23/2002SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
07/22/2002-3:50pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/22/2002-3:50pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5006)
07/22/2002-3:38pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2990.
07/22/2002-3:38pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5006-5008)
07/22/2002-3:38pmHouseMrs. Cubin moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/16/2002HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 347.
07/16/2002HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 107-580.
06/26/2002HouseSubcommittee on Water and Power Discharged.
06/26/2002HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Resources
06/26/2002HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Resources
05/03/2002HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power
10/09/2001HouseExecutive Comment Requested from Interior.
10/09/2001HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power.
Action By: Committee on Resources
10/02/2001HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
10/02/2001HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H6070)
10/02/2001HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Resources10/02/2001 Referred to
06/26/2002 Markup by
07/16/2002 Reported by H. Rept. 107-580
House Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power10/09/2001 Referred to
05/03/2002 Hearings by
06/26/2002 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources07/23/2002 Referred to
10/08/2002 Reported by
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power07/31/2002 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2990. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/22/2002)

Lower Rio Grande Valley Water Resources Conservation and Improvement Act of 2002 - Amends the Lower Rio Grande Valley Water Resources Conservation and Improvement Act of 2000 to: (1) authorize the construction of 20 additional specified projects in Texas; (2) require the Secretary of the Interior, acting through the Bureau of Reclamation, to undertake the Lower Rio Grande Water Conservation and Improvement Program through cooperative agreements; (3) require that project proposals be reviewed and evaluated under the guidelines set forth in a specified Bureau of Reclamation document; (4) require the Secretary to determine that a non-Federal project sponsor is financially capable of funding the non-Federal share of the project's costs, including operation, maintenance, repair, and replacement, and whether the project meets the guidelines; (5) permit project sponsors to contract with the Secretary to have the Secretary prepare the reports required under the Act (at a Federal cost share not to exceed 50 percent); (6) increase the authorization of appropriations for carrying out the Program; and (7) limit the non-Federal share of the total cost of any project carried out under or with assistance provided under the Act to 50 percent.