Text: H.R.2990 — 107th Congress (2001-2002)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 107-351 (12/17/2002)

 
[107th Congress Public Law 351]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]


<DOC>
[DOCID: f:publ351.107]


[[Page 2977]]

LOWER RIO GRANDE VALLEY WATER RESOURCES CONSERVATION AND IMPROVEMENT ACT 
                                 OF 2002

[[Page 116 STAT. 2978]]

Public Law 107-351
107th Congress

                                 An Act


 
 To amend the Lower Rio Grande Valley Water Resources Conservation and 
Improvement Act of 2000 to authorize additional projects under that Act, 
     and for other purposes. <<NOTE: Dec. 17, 2002 -  [H.R. 2990]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled, <<NOTE: Lower Rio Grande 
Valley Water Resources Conservation and Improvement Act of 2002.>> 

SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``Lower Rio Grande Valley Water 
Resources Conservation and Improvement Act of 2002''.

SEC. 2. AUTHORIZATION OF ADDITIONAL PROJECTS UNDER THE LOWER RIO GRANDE 
            VALLEY WATER RESOURCES CONSERVATION AND IMPROVEMENT ACT OF 
            2000.

    Section 4(a) of the Lower Rio Grande Valley Water Resources 
Conservation and Improvement Act of 2000 (Public Law 106-576; 114 Stat. 
3067) is amended by adding at the end the following:
            ``(5) In the United Irrigation District of Hidalgo County, 
        Texas, a pipeline and pumping system as identified in the 
        Sigler, Winston, Greenwood, Associates, Incorporated, study 
        dated January 2001.
            ``(6) In the Cameron County, Texas, Irrigation District No. 
        2, proposed improvements to Canal C, as identified in the 
        February 8, 2001, engineering report by Martin, Brown, and 
        Perez.
            ``(7) In the Cameron County, Texas, Irrigation District No. 
        2, a proposed Canal C and Canal 13 Inner Connect, as identified 
        in the February 12, 2001, engineering report by Martin, Brown, 
        and Perez.
            ``(8) In Delta Lake Irrigation District of Hidalgo and 
        Willacy Counties, Texas, proposed water conservation projects, 
        as identified by the AW Blair Engineering report of February 13, 
        2001.
            ``(9) In the Hidalgo and Cameron County, Texas, Irrigation 
        District No. 9, a proposed project to salvage spill water using 
        automatic control of canal gates as identified in the AW Blair 
        Engineering report dated February 14, 2001.
            ``(10) In the Brownsville Irrigation District of Cameron 
        County, Texas, a proposed main canal replacement as outlined in 
        the Holdar-Garcia & Associates engineering report dated February 
        14, 2001.
            ``(11) In the Hidalgo County, Texas, Irrigation District No. 
        16, a proposed off-district pump station project as identified 
        by the Melden & Hunt, Incorporated, engineering report dated 
        February 14, 2001.

[[Page 116 STAT. 2979]]

            ``(12) In the Hidalgo County, Texas, Irrigation District No. 
        1, a proposed canal replacement of the North Branch East Main, 
        as outlined in the Melden & Hunt, Incorporated, engineering 
        analysis dated February, 2001.
            ``(13) In the Donna (Texas) Irrigation District, a proposed 
        improvement project as identified by the Melden & Hunt, 
        Incorporated, engineering analysis dated February 13, 2001.
            ``(14) In the Hudspeth County, Texas, Conservation and 
        Reclamation District No. 1, the Alamo Arroyo Pumping Plant water 
        quality project as identified by the engineering report and 
        drawings by Gebhard-Sarma and Associates dated July 1996 and the 
        construction of a 1,000 acre-foot off-channel regulating 
        reservoir for the capture and conservation of irrigation water, 
        as identified in the engineering report by AW Blair Engineering 
        dated June 2002.
            ``(15) In the El Paso County, Texas, Water Improvement 
        District No. 1, the Riverside Canal Improvement Project Phase I 
        Reach A, a canal lining and water conservation project as 
        identified by the engineering report by AW Blair Engineering 
        dated June 2002.
            ``(16) In the Maverick County, Texas, Water Improvement and 
        Control District No. 1, the concrete lining project of 12 miles 
        of the Maverick Main Canal, identified in the engineering report 
        by AW Blair Engineering dated June 2002.
            ``(17) In the Hidalgo County, Texas, Irrigation District No. 
        6, rehabilitation of 10.2 miles of concrete lining in the main 
        canal between Lift Stations Nos. 2 and 3 as identified in the 
        engineering report by AW Blair Engineering dated June 2002.
            ``(18) In the Hidalgo County, Texas, Irrigation District No. 
        2, Wisconsin Canal Improvements as identified in the Sigler, 
        Winston, Greenwood & Associates, Incorporated, engineering 
        report dated February 2001.
            ``(19) In the Hidalgo County, Texas, Irrigation District No. 
        2, Lateral `A' Canal Improvements as identified in the Sigler, 
        Winston, Greenwood & Associates, Incorporated, engineering 
        report dated July 25, 2001.''.

SEC. 3. AMENDMENTS TO THE LOWER RIO GRANDE VALLEY WATER RESOURCES 
            CONSERVATION AND IMPROVEMENT ACT OF 2000.

    The Lower Rio Grande Valley Water Resources Conservation and 
Improvement Act of 2000 (Public Law 106-576; 114 Stat. 3065 et seq.) is 
further amended as follows:
            (1) Section 3(a) <<NOTE: 114 Stat. 3065.>>  is amended in 
        the first sentence by striking ``The Secretary'' and all that 
        follows through ``in cooperation'' and inserting ``The 
        Secretary, acting through the Bureau of Reclamation, shall 
        undertake a program under cooperative agreements''.
            (2) Section 3(b) is amended to read as follows:

    ``(b) Project Review.--Project proposals shall be reviewed and 
evaluated under the guidelines set forth in the document published by 
the Bureau of Reclamation entitled `Guidelines for Preparing and 
Reviewing Proposals for Water Conservation and Improvement Projects 
Under P.L. 106-576', dated June 2001.''.
            (3) Section 3(d) is amended by inserting before the period 
        at the end the following: ``, including operation, maintenance, 
        repair, and replacement''.

[[Page 116 STAT. 2980]]

            (4) Section 3(e) <<NOTE: 114 Stat. 3065.>>  is amended by 
        striking ``the criteria established pursuant to this section'' 
        and inserting ``the guidelines referred to in subsection (b)''.
            (5) Subsection (f) of section 3 is amended by striking ``to 
        prepare'' and all that follows through the end of the subsection 
        and inserting ``to have the Secretary prepare the reports 
        required under this section. The Federal share of the cost of 
        such preparation by the Secretary shall not exceed 50 percent of 
        the total cost of such preparation.''.
            (6) Section 3(g) is amended by striking ``$2,000,000'' and 
        inserting ``$8,000,000''.
            (7) Section 4(b) <<NOTE: 114 Stat. 3067.>>  is amended--
                    (A) in the first sentence by striking ``costs of any 
                construction'' and inserting ``total project cost of any 
                project''; and
                    (B) in the last sentence by inserting ``the actual'' 
                before ``funds''.
            (8) Section 4(c) is amended by striking ``$10,000,000'' and 
        inserting ``$47,000,000 (2001 dollars)''.

    Approved December 17, 2002.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.R. 2990:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

HOUSE REPORTS: No. 107-580 (Comm. on Resources).
CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 148 (2002):
            July 22, considered and passed House.
            Nov. 19, considered and passed Senate.

                                  <all>

Share This