Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 10/02/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 10/02/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 10/02/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 10/02/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 10/02/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 10/02/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 10/02/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 10/02/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/03/2001
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 10/04/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/04/2001
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 10/04/2001
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 10/04/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 10/04/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/04/2001
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/04/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 10/04/2001
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 10/04/2001
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 10/04/2001
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 10/04/2001
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 10/04/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 10/04/2001
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 10/04/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 10/04/2001
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 10/04/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 10/04/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/04/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/04/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 10/09/2001
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 10/09/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 10/10/2001
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 10/10/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 10/10/2001
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 10/11/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 10/11/2001
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 10/11/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 10/11/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/11/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 10/11/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 10/11/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 10/11/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 10/12/2001
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 10/12/2001
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 10/16/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 10/16/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/16/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 10/16/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 10/16/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/16/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 10/16/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/16/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/17/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 10/25/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/30/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/30/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/31/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 10/31/2001