Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 10/03/2001
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 10/03/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 10/03/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 10/03/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 10/03/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 10/03/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 10/03/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 10/03/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 10/04/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/04/2001
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/04/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 10/04/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 10/04/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/04/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 10/04/2001
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 10/04/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/04/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/04/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 10/04/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 10/09/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/09/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/09/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/09/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/11/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 10/11/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/11/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 10/11/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 10/12/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 10/12/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/12/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 10/12/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/16/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/16/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 10/16/2001
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 10/16/2001
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 10/16/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/17/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 10/17/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 10/17/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/17/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/30/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 10/30/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/30/2001
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 11/07/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/07/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 11/07/2001
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 11/15/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 11/15/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/15/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/16/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/19/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 12/19/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/29/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 01/29/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 02/28/2002