Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 10/03/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 10/03/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 10/03/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 10/03/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 10/03/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 10/03/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 10/03/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 10/03/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 10/03/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 10/03/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 10/03/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 10/03/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 10/03/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2]* 10/03/2001
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large]* 10/03/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 10/03/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 10/03/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 10/03/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 10/03/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 10/03/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 10/03/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 10/03/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 10/04/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/04/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/04/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 10/05/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 10/12/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/12/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/16/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 10/16/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/01/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/08/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/08/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/08/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/08/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 11/14/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/13/2001