Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 10/04/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 10/09/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/14/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 11/14/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 12/04/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 12/05/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 12/05/2001