Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 10/04/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 10/09/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 10/09/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/09/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/10/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 10/11/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/11/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/16/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/30/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 11/01/2001
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 11/01/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/01/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 11/06/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/06/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/06/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/06/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 11/06/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 11/06/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/08/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 11/08/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 11/14/2001
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 11/15/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/15/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 11/15/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 11/15/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/27/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 11/27/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 12/20/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/26/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/26/2002
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 03/06/2002